TX HR1895 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-18 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-18 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating Jean and James Pickney of Wills Point on their 65th wedding anniversary.
Title
Congratulating Jean and James Pickney of Wills Point on their 65th wedding anniversary.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-18 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-14 | Adopted | |
2009-05-14 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-08 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-07 | Filed |