TX HR1880 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Eagle Pass High School baseball coach Reynol Mendoza on his 300th career win.
Title
Congratulating Eagle Pass High School baseball coach Reynol Mendoza on his 300th career win.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-22 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-21 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-20 | House | Filed |