TX HR1864 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Weldon Burgoon of Weldon's Saddle Shop and Western Wear in Denton on his retirement after 60 years in business.
Title
Congratulating Weldon Burgoon of Weldon's Saddle Shop and Western Wear in Denton on his retirement after 60 years in business.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-12 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-12 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-10 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-05-02 | House | Filed |