TX HR186 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing support for the strengthening of the partnership between the U.S. and Taiwan and for the expansion of Taiwan's role on the global stage.
Title
Expressing support for the strengthening of the partnership between the U.S. and Taiwan and for the expansion of Taiwan's role on the global stage.
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Sherman [D] | Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Hubert Vo [D] | Rep. Jacey Jetton [R] |
Rep. Alma Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Adopted RV#1202 (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1202 |
2021-05-14 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-14 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on Resolutions Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-28 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |