TX HR186 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Polk County Criminal District Attorney William Lee Hon on his election to the Criminal Justice Council of the State Bar of Texas.
Title
Congratulating Polk County Criminal District Attorney William Lee Hon on his election to the Criminal Justice Council of the State Bar of Texas.
Sponsors
Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-08-15 | House | Adopted |
2017-08-15 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-08-15 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-08-14 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-08-02 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-08-02 | House | Filed |