TX HR1821 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Daniel Cox on being named the 2019 Secondary Teacher of the Year by the Plano Independent School District.
Title
Congratulating Daniel Cox on being named the 2019 Secondary Teacher of the Year by the Plano Independent School District.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-24 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-22 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-21 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-20 | House | Filed |