TX HR1820 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Dora Oaxaca for her service as El Paso County Democratic Chair during Women's History Month.
Title
Honoring Dora Oaxaca for her service as El Paso County Democratic Chair during Women's History Month.
Sponsors
Rep. Claudia Ordaz Perez [D] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Lina Ortega [D] |
Rep. Art Fierro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-31 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-31 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-31 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-30 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-29 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-27 | House | Filed |