TX HR1803 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-20 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-20 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating L. D. and Barbara Parsons of Waco on their 65th wedding anniversary.
Title
Congratulating L. D. and Barbara Parsons of Waco on their 65th wedding anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-20 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-11 | Adopted | |
2009-05-11 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-11 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-05 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-04 | Filed |