TX HR1746 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Monsignor Leo Wleczyk of St. Michael the Archangel Catholic Church on the 50th anniversary of his ordination.
Title
Congratulating Monsignor Leo Wleczyk of St. Michael the Archangel Catholic Church on the 50th anniversary of his ordination.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-07 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-07 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-05-07 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-05-04 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-04-02 | House | Filed |