TX HR1746 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Waxahachie High School boys' golf teams on their success at the 2011 district and regional tournaments.
Title
Congratulating the Waxahachie High School boys' golf teams on their success at the 2011 district and regional tournaments.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Pitts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-12 | Adopted | |
2011-05-12 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-12 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-10 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-05-05 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-05-04 | Filed |