TX HR1725 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Dustin Chris Ruiz on graduating as salutatorian of the Class of 2021 at Mesquite High School.
Title
Congratulating Dustin Chris Ruiz on graduating as salutatorian of the Class of 2021 at Mesquite High School.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-29 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-29 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-29 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-28 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-27 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-25 | House | Filed |