TX HR1720 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring the Community Historical Archaeology Project with Schools program on its receipt of the 2020 Governor's Award for Historic Preservation.
Title
Honoring the Community Historical Archaeology Project with Schools program on its receipt of the 2020 Governor's Award for Historic Preservation.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. Terry Canales [D] | Rep. Armando Martinez [D] | Rep. Alex Dominguez [D] |
Rep. Robert Guerra [D] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Oscar Longoria [D] | Rep. Sergio Munoz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-29 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-29 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-29 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-28 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-27 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMMUNITY HISTORICAL ARCHAEOLOGY PROJECT WITH SCHOOLS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary