TX HR1717 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Matthew Donald Whorton for earning the title of valedictorian of the Class of 2019 at Texas Connections Academy at Houston.
Title
Congratulating Matthew Donald Whorton for earning the title of valedictorian of the Class of 2019 at Texas Connections Academy at Houston.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-24 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-22 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-21 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Filed |