TX HR1696 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Dr. Bobby B. Lyle on his receipt of the Human Relations Award from the American Jewish Committee of Dallas.
Title
Congratulating Dr. Bobby B. Lyle on his receipt of the Human Relations Award from the American Jewish Committee of Dallas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-01 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-01 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-05-01 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-04-29 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-04-24 | House | Filed |