TX HR1696 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Velma Brown on her election to the board of the Sienna and East Fort Bend Democrats Club.
Title
Congratulating Velma Brown on her election to the board of the Sienna and East Fort Bend Democrats Club.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-12 | Adopted | |
2011-05-12 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-12 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-10 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-05-03 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-05-02 | Filed |