TX HR1689 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Latwanna Clark and her daughter, Kay Clark, on the opening of their bakery, Kay's Cookiez, in Mesquite.
Title
Congratulating Latwanna Clark and her daughter, Kay Clark, on the opening of their bakery, Kay's Cookiez, in Mesquite.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-29 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-29 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-29 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-28 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-27 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-24 | House | Filed |