TX HR1640 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Leah Hanany on being elected to the El Paso ISD Board of Trustees.
Title
Congratulating Leah Hanany on being elected to the El Paso ISD Board of Trustees.
Sponsors
Rep. Art Fierro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-29 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-29 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-29 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-28 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-27 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-24 | House | Filed |