TX HR1615 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Guadalupe Cruz on graduating as valedictorian of the Class of 2021 at Middle College High School at HCC Gulfton.
Title
Congratulating Guadalupe Cruz on graduating as valedictorian of the Class of 2021 at Middle College High School at HCC Gulfton.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-29 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-29 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-29 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-28 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-24 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-23 | House | Filed |