TX HR1613 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing May 14, 2019, as Salad Day at the State Capitol and commending the owners/operators of Texas McDonald's restaurants for their contributions to the state's economy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing May 14, 2019, as Salad Day at the State Capitol and commending the owners/operators of Texas McDonald's restaurants for their contributions to the state's economy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-14HouseAdopted
2019-05-14HouseRules suspended
2019-05-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback