TX HR161 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Grace Pierson on her retirement as executive assistant with the Dumas Economic Development Corporation.
Title
Congratulating Grace Pierson on her retirement as executive assistant with the Dumas Economic Development Corporation.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-10-18 | House | Adopted |
2021-10-18 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-10-18 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-10-15 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-10-14 | House | Filed |