TX HR1605 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Welcoming members of the Northeast Christian Academy community to the State Capitol on May 16, 2011.
Title
Welcoming members of the Northeast Christian Academy community to the State Capitol on May 16, 2011.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Huberty [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-16 | Adopted | |
2011-05-16 | Rules suspended | |
2011-05-03 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-04-28 | Filed |