TX HR1601 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring the commitment of the Texas Young Republican Federation Policy Committee during the 86th Legislative Session.
Title
Honoring the commitment of the Texas Young Republican Federation Policy Committee during the 86th Legislative Session.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-17 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-17 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-17 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
YOUNG REPUBLICAN FEDERATION POLICY COMMITTEE, TEXAS
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
YOUNG REPUBLICAN FEDERATION POLICY COMMITTEE, TEXAS