TX HR1592 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Honoring First United Methodist Church in Lubbock for its history of service to the local community.
Title
Honoring First United Methodist Church in Lubbock for its history of service to the local community.
Sponsors
Rep. Hubert Vo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-04-30 | Adopted | |
2009-04-30 | Rules suspended | |
2009-04-27 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-04-24 | Filed |