TX HR1587 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Abel Gonzalez IV on graduating as salutatorian of the Class of 2019 at Harold T. Branch Academy in Corpus Christi.
Title
Congratulating Abel Gonzalez IV on graduating as salutatorian of the Class of 2019 at Harold T. Branch Academy in Corpus Christi.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-17 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-17 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-17 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-09 | House | Filed |