TX HR1567 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Texas Tech University basketball player Jarrett Culver on declaring for the 2019 NBA Draft.
Title
Congratulating Texas Tech University basketball player Jarrett Culver on declaring for the 2019 NBA Draft.
Sponsors
Rep. John Frullo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-17 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-17 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-17 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-08 | House | Filed |