TX HR1560 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Wilhelm Williams Moye and Tena Williams Simien for their decades of service as educators in Matagorda and Brazoria Counties.
Title
Commending Wilhelm Williams Moye and Tena Williams Simien for their decades of service as educators in Matagorda and Brazoria Counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-17 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-17 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-17 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-08 | House | Filed |