TX HR1559 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Gamma Sigma Philo Affiliate of Sigma Gamma Rho Sorority on its 70th anniversary.
Title
Congratulating the Gamma Sigma Philo Affiliate of Sigma Gamma Rho Sorority on its 70th anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-16 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-05-17 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-08 | House | Filed |