TX HR1557 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending Deborah W. Seigman for her exemplary career in education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending Deborah W. Seigman for her exemplary career in education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-20HouseReported enrolled
2023-05-19HouseAdopted
2023-05-19HouseLaid before the House
2023-05-19HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2023-05-17HouseConsidered in Resolutions Calendars
2023-05-10HouseReferred to Resolutions Calendars
2023-05-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback