TX HR1552 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Withdrawn from calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing April 22, 2019, as Red and White Day at the State Capitol in honor of the advocacy efforts of the Delta Sigma Theta Sorority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing April 22, 2019, as Red and White Day at the State Capitol in honor of the advocacy efforts of the Delta Sigma Theta Sorority.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseWithdrawn from calendar
2019-05-17HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2019-05-15HouseConsidered in Resolutions Calendars
2019-05-14HouseReferred to Resolutions Calendars
2019-05-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback