TX HR1549 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Margaret Taylor Smith for her efforts in behalf of Texans with learning disabilities.
Title
Commending Margaret Taylor Smith for her efforts in behalf of Texans with learning disabilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-17 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-17 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-17 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-07 | House | Filed |