TX HR1538 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of former Texas Tech University football head coach William Taylor "Spike" Dykes.
Title
In memory of former Texas Tech University football head coach William Taylor "Spike" Dykes.
Sponsors
Rep. John Frullo [R] | Rep. Dustin Burrows [R] | Rep. Drew Darby [R] | Rep. Tom Craddick [R] |
Rep. Kevin Roberts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-04 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-04 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-01 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-04-21 | House | Filed |