TX HR1514 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing May 2019 as International Internal Audit Awareness Month.
Title
Recognizing May 2019 as International Internal Audit Awareness Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-08 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
INTERNATIONAL INTERNAL AUDIT AWARENESS MONTH
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates