TX HR1511 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Congratulating RJ Hampton of Little Elm High School on being named the 2018-2019 Gatorade State Boys Basketball Player of the Year for Texas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congratulating RJ Hampton of Little Elm High School on being named the 2018-2019 Gatorade State Boys Basketball Player of the Year for Texas.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-10HouseAdopted
2019-05-10HouseLaid before the House
2019-05-10HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2019-05-08HouseConsidered in Resolutions Calendars
2019-05-06HouseReferred to Resolutions Calendars
2019-05-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback