TX HR1499 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Christian Isaac Dominguez on graduating as the 2019 valedictorian of West Oso High School in Corpus Christi.
Title
Congratulating Christian Isaac Dominguez on graduating as the 2019 valedictorian of West Oso High School in Corpus Christi.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-10 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-10 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-08 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-03 | House | Filed |