TX HR1496 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Randal Garza on graduating as the salutatorian of the Agua Dulce High School Class of 2019.
Title
Congratulating Randal Garza on graduating as the salutatorian of the Agua Dulce High School Class of 2019.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-10 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-10 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-08 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-03 | House | Filed |