TX HR1489 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing May 9, 2017, as Hutto Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing May 9, 2017, as Hutto Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-04 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-04 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-01 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-04-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
HUTTO DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates