TX HR1473 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating Women Veterans Day on June 12, 2021.
Title
Commemorating Women Veterans Day on June 12, 2021.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-26 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-26 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-26 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-24 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-21 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
WOMEN VETERANS DAY
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
WOMEN VETERANS DAY