TX HR1419 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Honoring U.S. Army Sergeant (Ret.) Steve Land of Belton for his distinguished service to his country.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honoring U.S. Army Sergeant (Ret.) Steve Land of Belton for his distinguished service to his country.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04HouseReported enrolled
2017-04-27HouseAdopted
2017-04-27HouseLaid before the House
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2017-04-25HouseConsidered in Rules and Resolutions
2017-04-17HouseReferred to Rules & Resolutions
2017-04-13HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback