TX HR1419 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing September 28 to October 2, 2015, as Malnutrition Awareness Week in Texas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing September 28 to October 2, 2015, as Malnutrition Awareness Week in Texas.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-24HouseReported enrolled
2015-03-23HouseAdopted
2015-03-23HouseRules suspended
2015-03-19HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback