TX HR1402 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending Kelsey Van Noy for her service as vice president of student development of the Student Government Association at Texas Tech University Health Sciences Center El Paso.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending Kelsey Van Noy for her service as vice president of student development of the Student Government Association at Texas Tech University Health Sciences Center El Paso.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-15HouseReported enrolled
2023-05-12HouseAdopted
2023-05-12HouseLaid before the House
2023-05-12HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2023-05-10HouseConsidered in Resolutions Calendars
2023-05-03HouseReferred to Resolutions Calendars
2023-05-01HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback