TX HR1400 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 10th anniversary of the Travis County Mental Health Public Defender office.
Title
Commemorating the 10th anniversary of the Travis County Mental Health Public Defender office.
Sponsors
Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D] | Rep. Paul Workman [R] | Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] | Rep. Donna Howard [D] |
Rep. Celia Israel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-04-26 | House | Adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-04-12 | House | Filed |