TX HR1400 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-30 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-30 - Reported enrolled
Summary
In memory of U.S. Army Corporal Javier G. Paredes of San Antonio.
Title
In memory of U.S. Army Corporal Javier G. Paredes of San Antonio.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-30 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-04-27 | Adopted | |
2009-04-27 | Laid before the House | |
2009-04-27 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-04-20 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-04-17 | Filed |