TX HR140 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Alex Michael Gustin, salutatorian of the Central Baptist Christian Academy Class of 2013.
Title
Congratulating Alex Michael Gustin, salutatorian of the Central Baptist Christian Academy Class of 2013.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-06-25 | House | Adopted |
2013-06-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-06-19 | House | Filed |