TX HR1374 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Lynn Wyatt of Houston on being named the 2017 Texas Medal of Arts honoree for Individual Arts Patron.
Title
Congratulating Lynn Wyatt of Houston on being named the 2017 Texas Medal of Arts honoree for Individual Arts Patron.
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-04-27 | House | Adopted |
2017-04-27 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-04-11 | House | Filed |