TX HR137 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Briana Gonzalez for her service as an intern in the office of State Representative Jim Murphy.
Title
Commending Briana Gonzalez for her service as an intern in the office of State Representative Jim Murphy.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-10-18 | House | Adopted |
2021-10-18 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-10-18 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-10-13 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-10-12 | House | Filed |