TX HR1363 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Tyler Mathieson of Melissa High School on being named the state champion in Technical Computer Applications at the 2023 SkillsUSA Texas Leadership and Skills Conference.
Title
Congratulating Tyler Mathieson of Melissa High School on being named the state champion in Technical Computer Applications at the 2023 SkillsUSA Texas Leadership and Skills Conference.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-12 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-12 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-05-12 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-05-10 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-03 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-01 | House | Filed |