TX HR1360 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating McKinney High School in McKinney ISD on its receipt of the Schools Transforming Learning designation from N2 Learning.
Title
Congratulating McKinney High School in McKinney ISD on its receipt of the Schools Transforming Learning designation from N2 Learning.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-12 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-12 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-05-12 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-05-10 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-03 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-01 | House | Filed |