TX HR136 | 2011 | 82nd Legislature 1st Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Charlotte Ramsey of Cedar Park on her retirement from Pleasant Hill Elementary School in Leander.
Title
Congratulating Charlotte Ramsey of Cedar Park on her retirement from Pleasant Hill Elementary School in Leander.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-06 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-06-28 | Adopted | |
2011-06-28 | Rules suspended | |
2011-06-24 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-06-17 | Filed |