TX HR1346 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Edinburg High School cheerleading team on its victory at the 2023 National Cheerleaders Association High School National Championship.
Title
Congratulating the Edinburg High School cheerleading team on its victory at the 2023 National Cheerleaders Association High School National Championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-12 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-12 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-05-12 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-05-10 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-02 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-01 | House | Filed |