TX HR1343 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to pass H.R. 412, designating the U.S. Post Office at 620 East Pecan Boulevard in McAllen as the Agent Raul H. Gonzalez Jr. Memorial Post Office.
Title
Urging Congress to pass H.R. 412, designating the U.S. Post Office at 620 East Pecan Boulevard in McAllen as the Agent Raul H. Gonzalez Jr. Memorial Post Office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - House - Adopted RV#1972 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1972 |
2023-05-23 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-23 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-05-20 | House | Placed on Resolutions Calendar |
2023-05-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-03 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2023-05-03 | House | Correction in referral |
2023-05-02 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-01 | House | Filed |